Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Muscio, Thomas, against Blach, Michael Kent, represented by Ogren, David I, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Iwasko, James F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIwasko, James F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2003 |
CategoryMisdemeanor (Purged) |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2003 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Readiness & Settlement
Judge: Hammer, Barry |
|
February 10, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 13, 2003 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Readiness & Settlement
Judge: Bailey, William, Jr |
|
January 13, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
December 12, 2002 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Arraignment Continued
Judge: Bailey, William, Jr |
|
December 12, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
December 03, 2002 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Arraignment Continued
Judge: Hall, Diana R |
|
December 03, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
November 26, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
November 26, 2002 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Arraignment
Judge: Hall, Diana R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.