Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Plumer, Steven B, against Ward, Christopher Scott, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Flores, Rogelio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFlores, Rogelio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2002 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to FTB COD | |
October 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Warrant Recall: Order Dated 6/10/08 | |
October 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Restored To Court Control | |
October 22, 2008 | Docket Event | FTP Notice, Mailed | |
January 02, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 02, 2002 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Removed From Court Control | |
January 02, 2002 | Docket Event | Warrant, Issued | |
January 02, 2002 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
January 02, 2002 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte: Issue Bench/Arrest Warrant
Judge: Beck, Barbara J |
|
February 27, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Judge, No Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.