Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Reyes, Jose Luis Jimenez, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Hall, Diana R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHall, Diana R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2001 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedJune 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to Alliance One | |
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Returned from Collection Agency | |
October 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Warrant Recall: Order Dated 6/10/08 | |
October 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Restored To Court Control | |
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event | FTP Notice, Mailed | |
July 12, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant, Issued | |
July 12, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Removed From Court Control | |
July 12, 2001 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte: Request/Review
Judge: Hall, Diana R |
|
February 13, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Belasco, Steven D |
|
February 13, 2001 | Docket Event | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.