Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Johnson, Vicki C, against Bielawski, Robert, represented by Williamson, Kc, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Adams, Thomas R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdams, Thomas R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2002 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedMay 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2003 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Filed | |
January 24, 2003 | Docket Event |
Sentence/Disposition Hearing
Judge: Adams, Thomas R |
|
January 24, 2003 | Docket Event | Sentencing Hearing Held | |
January 24, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 24, 2003 | Docket Event | Order, Filed | |
December 20, 2002 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Hearing Setting
Judge: Adams, Thomas R |
|
December 20, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
December 16, 2002 | Docket Event | Probation Violation Report, Received | |
December 06, 2002 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Hearing Setting
Judge: Adams, Thomas R |
|
December 06, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.