Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Mcintosh, Desmond, against Xxxxx, Xxxxx Xxxxx, represented by Pre Sustain Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Talmage, Deborah presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTalmage, Deborah Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2001 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant Recall, Filed | |
July 16, 2001 | Docket Event |
Warrant Arraignment
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
July 16, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Restored To Court Control | |
June 12, 2001 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte: Request/Review
Judge: Loberg, Harry |
|
June 12, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant, Issued | |
June 12, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Removed From Court Control | |
March 05, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: DeCaro, Edward |
|
March 05, 2001 | Docket Event | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered | |
February 20, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
January 31, 2001 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.