Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Mcroyal, Lionel Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with DeCaro, Edward presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeCaro, Edward Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2001 |
CategoryInfraction (Purged) |
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Restored to Court Control | |
March 12, 2001 | Docket Event | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered | |
March 12, 2001 | Docket Event |
Warrant Arraignment
Judge: DeCaro, Edward |
|
March 12, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant Recall, Filed | |
February 20, 2001 | Docket Event |
Warrant Arraignment
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
February 14, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant, Issued | |
February 14, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: DeCaro, Edward |
|
February 14, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Removed From Court Control | |
January 25, 2001 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.