Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Mcintosh, Desmond, against Bermudez, Jose Vargas, represented by Behrens, Meghan M, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Adams, Thomas R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdams, Thomas R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2001 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedJune 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Informational Purposes
Judge: DeCaro, Edward |
|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
August 13, 2001 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte: Request/Review
Judge: Judge, No Assigned |
|
April 10, 2001 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Adams, Thomas R |
|
April 10, 2001 | Docket Event | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered | |
April 10, 2001 | Docket Event | Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court | |
March 02, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: DeCaro, Edward |
|
February 16, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: DeCaro, Edward |
|
January 29, 2001 | Docket Event | Interpreter Required on Case | |
January 29, 2001 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.