Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Da, against Schultz, Russell A, Jr, represented by Pre Sustain Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Loberg, Harry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLoberg, Harry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2001 |
CategoryMisdemeanor (Purged) |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2001 | Docket Event | Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court | |
March 19, 2001 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation
Judge: Loberg, Harry |
|
March 16, 2001 | Docket Event |
Pre-Sustain Court Event
Judge: Loberg, Harry |
|
March 08, 2001 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Loberg, Harry |
|
February 27, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Restored To Court Control | |
February 26, 2001 | Docket Event | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered | |
February 26, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant Recall, Filed | |
February 26, 2001 | Docket Event |
Warrant Arraignment
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
February 06, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: DeCaro, Edward |
|
February 06, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Removed From Court Control |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.