Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cherry, Robert L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cherry, Patricia Louise Franks, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with William R. Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam R. Patrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 1988 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE FILE IMAGED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARN | |
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTY FOR PETITIONER [ATTY: M HOWELL] ATTY H/D Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DAB |
|
February 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Findings and Order After Hearing FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING 4/19/05 HRG HON. WILLIAM R PATRICK; JUDGE (B04) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
April 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Other hearing Desc: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT Disp Code: 374 - STIPULATION ENTERED Disp Clerk: MJO Filing Clerk: MJO Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
April 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Recusal By Judge Steven Howell RECUSAL BY JUDGE STEVEN J HOWELL Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR |
|
April 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT Desc3: *CONT'D FROM TRAC 03/07/05* Disp Code: 905 - CONT 04/19/05 10:30 AM Disp Clerk: MJO Filing Clerk: KKA Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
March 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Conference Desc: TRAC --- [1/2 DAY ] ***# of cont Desc2: [R] MOTION FILED 12/03/04 ] Desc3: [Issues: C/S ] Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 04/05/05 8:30 AM B04-STATUS Disp Clerk: KKA Filing Clerk: MJO Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
February 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing Desc: [R] MTN FOR C/S Desc2: *FILED 12/03/04* Disp Code: 363 - SET ON 03/07/05 TRAC Disp Clerk: MJO Filing Clerk: JAS Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
January 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information PTNR'S REQUEST FOR LIVE TESTIMONY - FAXED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR |
|
January 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration RESP DECL TO OSC/NTC OF MOTION - FAXED PTNR'S Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.