Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Britaney Elvira Gomez, Gomez, Britaney Elvira, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2017 |
CategoryTraffic: Juvenile Infractions |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Abstract | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event | DMV ZK Abstract FTA Recall -Amended Code K, Disp Code Z | |
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Traffic School Referral | |
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Abstract |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.