Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE SUSSEX presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE SUSSEX Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryMonitions Judgment |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 31, 2022 NOTICE |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 19, 2022 THIS JUDGMENT DEBT INTEREST AND COSTS FULLY PAID AND SATISFIED THIS 18TH DAY OF MARCH, 2022 SO SAITH RYAN T. ADAMS ATTEST: MYRTLE A. THOMAS, PROTHONOTARY. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 67405149 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
POWER OF ATTORNEY FROM DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 18, 2022 POWER OF ATTORNEY FROM RYAN T. ADAMS AUTHORIZING MYRTLE A. THOMAS, PROTHONOTARY TO SATISFY JUDGMENT. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 67401756 POWER OF ATTORNEY FILED |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 5, 2022 WRIT RETURNED 02-04-2022, LANDS AND TENEMENT TO BE SOLD ON 02-15-2022 AND SALE STAYED ON 02-03-2022. RETURNED TO COURT PER ATTORNEY. LETTER IS ATTACHED. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 67290709 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 18, 2021 WRIT VEND EX ISSUED 12-17-2021 TO THE SHERIFF OF SUSSEX COUNTY. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 67177242 WRIT ISSUED |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: VEND EX (VENDITIONI EXPONAS) DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 17, 2021 WRIT OF VEND EX PRAECIPE TO WRIT OF VEND EX ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 67172360 VEND EX (VENDITIONI EXPONAS) |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 9, 2021 WRIT RETURNED 09-08-2021, SUMMONS WAS POSTED ON THE PROPERTY BY DEPUTY 09-03-2021. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 66911304 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 2, 2021 MONITION WRIT ISSUED 09-01-2021 TO THE SHERIFF OF SUSSEX COUNTY TO POST UPON THE DEFENDANT'S PROPERTY. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 66896202 WRIT ISSUED |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MONITIONS DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 31, 2021 INIT FILING MONITIONS |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 31, 2021 COMPLAINT FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON MONITION FILED. TAX MAP PARCEL NO: 134-6.00-6.00 DESCRIPTION: 500' W RT 341B, 0.5 MI N/RT 341 OFF LINN LANE DAGSBORO, DE 19939 TAX YEARS: 2013-2021 AMOUNT: $2,186.48 (RYAN T. ADAMS) PRAECIPE TO WRIT OF MONITION ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 66888811 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.