Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Department Of Finance Of Sussex County, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Adams, Ryan T, against Nesmith, Eddie, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE SUSSEX presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE SUSSEX Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryMonitions Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-REDEMPTION DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 28, 2023 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-REDEMPTION ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 69016245 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-REDEMPTION |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 22, 2022 WRIT RETURNED 11-21-2022. LANDS AND TENEMENTS ADVERTISED AND SOLD 10-18-2022 AT 9:30AM AND THEREAFTER, AT THE SHERIFF'S OFFICE IN GEORGETOWN, GEORGETOWN HUNDRED. SUSSEX COUNTY, STATE OF DELAWARE TO JACQUELINE M HICKMAN, THEY BEING THE BEST AND HIGHEST BIDDER, FOR THE SUM OF EIGHTEEN THOUSAND SIX HUNDRED DOLLARS AND ZERO CENTS ($18,600.00) THAT BEING THE BEST AND HIGHEST BID. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 68410236 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS OF SHERIFF'S SALE AND PROOF OF POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 69 (G) FILED DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 13, 2022 AFFIDAVIT OF COUNSEL EXHIBITS A THROUGH C TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF COUNSEL ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 68244019 CIVIL RULE 69 (G) |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 18, 2021 WRIT VEND EX ISSUED 12-17-2021 TO THE SHERIFF OF SUSSEX COUNTY. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 67177200 WRIT ISSUED |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: VEND EX (VENDITIONI EXPONAS) DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 17, 2021 WRIT OF VEND EX PRAECIPE TO WRIT OF VEND EX ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 67172371 VEND EX (VENDITIONI EXPONAS) |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 9, 2021 WRIT RETURNED 09-08-2021, SUMMONS WAS POSTED ON THE PROPERTY BY DEPUTY 09-03-2021. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 66911085 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 2, 2021 MONITION WRIT ISSUED 09-01-2021 TO THE SHERIFF OF SUSSEX COUNTY TO POST UPON THE DEFENDANT'S PROPERTY. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 66896223 WRIT ISSUED |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 31, 2021 COMPLAINT FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON MONITION FILED. TAX MAP PARCEL NO: 230-31.00-123.00 DESCRIPTION: FITZGERALD LANDS LOT 84 14522 WILLOW GROVE LANE ELLENDALE, DE 19941 TAX YEARS: 2009-2021 & 2016-2022 AMOUNT: $5,739.26 - WATER & SEWER $8,117.52 (RYAN T. ADAMS) PRAECIPE TO WRIT OF MONITION MONITION AND EXHIBITS A AND B ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 66888758 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MONITIONS DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 31, 2021 INIT FILING MONITIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.