Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE SUSSEX presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE SUSSEX Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryMonitions Judgment |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 4, 2022 NOTICE |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 1, 2022 THIS JUDGMENT DEBT INTEREST AND COSTS FULLY PAID AND SATISFIED THIS 31ST DAY OF JANUARY, 2022 SO SAITH RYAN T. ADAMS ATTEST: MYRTLE A. THOMAS, PROTHONOTARY. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 67276009 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
POWER OF ATTORNEY FROM DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 28, 2022 POWER OF ATTORNEY FROM RYAN T. ADAMS AUTHORIZING PROTHONOTARY OF SUPERIOR COURT TO SATISFY JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 67269477 POWER OF ATTORNEY FILED |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 17, 2021 WRIT RETURNED 12-16-2021, LANDS AND TENEMENTS TO BE SOLD ON 01-18-2022 AND SALE STAYED ON 12-15-2021. RETURNED TO COURT PER ATTORNEY. LETTER IS ATTACHED. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 67172270 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 10, 2021 VEND EX WRIT ISSUED 11-09-2021, TO THE SHERIFF OF SUSSEX COUNTY. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 67080511 WRIT ISSUED |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: VEND EX (VENDITIONI EXPONAS) DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 6, 2021 WRIT OF VEND EX PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 67073848 VEND EX (VENDITIONI EXPONAS) |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 18, 2021 WRIT RETURNED 08-17-2021, SUMMONS WAS POSTED 08-16-2021 ON THE PROPERTY BY THE DEPUTY. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 66854304 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 13, 2021 MONITION WRIT ISSUED 08-12-2021 TO THE SHERIFF OF SUSSEX COUNTY TO POST UPON THE DEFENDANT'S PROPERTY. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 66843686 WRIT ISSUED |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MONITIONS DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 11, 2021 INIT FILING MONITIONS |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 11, 2021 COMPLAINT FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON MONITION FILED. TAX MAP PARCEL NO: 531-17.00-10.04 DESCRIPTION: N/RT 538 29248 AND 29288 ELLIS MILL ROAD, SEAFORD, DE 19973 TAX YEARS: 2018-2020 AMOUNT: $3,845.77 (RYAN ADAMS) PRAECIPE TO WRIT OF MONITION MONITION AND EXHIBITS A AND B ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 66836407 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.