Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with CRAIG A. KARSNITZ presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCRAIG A. KARSNITZ Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryMonitions Judgment |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
PER S23M-05-005 DISBURSEMENT PROCESSED IN THE AMOUNT OF $24,991.49 PAYABLE TO DELAWARE DIVISION OF REVENUE-DM DATE DOCKETED: JULY 20, 2023 DISBURSEMENT PROCESSED |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
S23M-05-005 ORDER TO DISBURSE EXCESS SHERIFF PROCEEDS RECEIVED IN ACCOUNTING-DM DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 30, 2023 ORDER TO DISBURSE EXCESS SHERI |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PETITION FOR RELEASE OF UNCLAIMED PROCEEDS FILED ON 12-12-22 (CASE S22M-12-003) DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 12, 2022 - THIS CASE WAS VOLUNTARILY DISMISSED NOTICE |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 4, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE CRAIG A. KARSNITZ 6-2-2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THE COURT HEREBY CONFIRMS THE SALE AND DIRECTS THE SHERIFF OF SUSSEX COUNTY TO EXECUTE, ACKNOWLEDGE AND DELIVER A DEED CONVEYING TITLE TO THE PROPERTY TO PETITIONER. ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 67691156 ORDER |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR DEED OF CONVEYANCE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 2, 2022 PETITION FOR DEED OF CONVEYANCE (ETTA R. MAYERS) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE DEED PROPOSED ORDER ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 67675069 PETITION DEED OF CONVEYANCE |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
A Payment of -$24,774.47 was made on receipt SCU9411995. RECEIPT FILED |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
RECEIVED FROM SUSSEX COUNTY COUNCIL, CHECK NO. 1219896 IN THE AMOUNT OF $24,774.47 FOR EXCESS PROCEEDS - MT DATE DOCKETED: MAY 11, 2022 NOTICE |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-REDEMPTION DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 19, 2022 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-REDEMPTION ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 67484191 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-REDEMPTION |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 6, 2022 AMENDED SHERIFF'S RETURN 04-05-2022. LANDS AND TENEMENTS ADVERTISED AND SOLD ON 01-18-2022 AT 9:30AM AND THEREAFTER, AT THE SHERIFF'S OFFICE IN GEORGETOWN, GEORGETOWN HUNDRED, SUSSEX COUNTY, STATE OF DELAWARE TO GENERATING PASSIVE INCOME BIDDER: RECORDO R. NOCK, THEY BEING THE BEST AND HIGHEST BIDDER FOR THE SUM OF THIRTY THREE THOUSAND DOLLARS AND ZERO CENTS ($33,000.00) THAT BEING THE BEST AND HIGHEST BID. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 67454265 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 22, 2022 WRIT RETURNED 02-21-2022. LANDS AND TENEMENTS ADVERTISED AND SOLD ON 01-18-22 AT 9:30AM AND THEREAFTER, AT THE SHERIFF'S OFFICE IN GEORGETOWN, GEORGETOWN HUNDRED , SUSSEX COUNTY, STATE OF DELAWARE TO RECORDO R. NOCK, THEY BEING THE BEST AND HIGHEST BIDDER FOR THE SUM OF THIRTY THREE THOUSAND DOLLARS AND ZERO CENTS ($33,000.00) THEY BEING THE BEST AND HIGHEST BID. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 67331752 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.