Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE SUSSEX presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE SUSSEX Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryMonitions Judgment |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 5, 2021 NOTICE |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 15, 2021 THIS JUDGMENT DEBT INTEREST AND COSTS FULLY PAID AND SATISFIED THIS 14TH DAY OF SEPTEMBER, 2021 SO SAITH RYAN ADAMS, POA ATTEST. MYRTLE A. THOMAS, PROTHONOTARY. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 66928308 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
POWER OF ATTORNEY FROM DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 11, 2021 POWER OF ATTORNEY FROM RYAN ADAMS AUTHORIZING MYRTLE A. THOMAS, PROTHONOTARY TO SATISFY JUDGMENT. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 66920154 POWER OF ATTORNEY FILED |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 18, 2021 WRIT RETURNED 08-17-2021, SUMMONS WAS POSTED 08-16-2021 ON THE PROPERTY BY DEPUTY. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 66854312 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 13, 2021 MONITION WRIT ISSUED 08-12-2021 TO THE SHERIFF OF SUSSEX COUNTY TO POST UPON THE DEFENDANT'S PROPERTY. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 66843722 WRIT ISSUED |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 11, 2021 COMPLAINT FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON MONITION FILED. TAX MAP PARCEL NO: 530-13.00-45.00 DESCRIPTION: L C NEWTON GREENWD, N/RT 583 800', E/RT 590 14634 ADAMS ROAD GREENWOOD, DE 19950 TAX YEARS: 2001-2020 AMOUNT: $14,114.09 (RYAN ADAMS) PRAECIPE TO WRIT OF MONITION MONITION AND EXHIBIT A AND B ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 66836330 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MONITIONS DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 11, 2021 INIT FILING MONITIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.