Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Structured Settlement case in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with KARSNITZ, CRAIG A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKARSNITZ, CRAIG A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryStructured Settlement |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DOCUMENT REQUEST BEING COMPLETED DATE DOCKETED: JULY 1, 2022 NOTICE |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 17, 2021 NOTICE |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
CIVIL MOTION HEARD 10/15/2021 - BC JUDGE CRAIG A. KARSNITZ PRESIDING STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT GRANTED DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 15, 2021 MOTION GRANTED |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 16, 2021 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE CRAIG A. KARSNITZ 10-15-2021. STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT GRANTED ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 67017948 ORDER SIGNED/GRANTED (MISC) |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ACTION FORM DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 16, 2021 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM FROM 10-15-2021 MOTION ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 67017948 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 15, 2021 UPDATED PROPOSED ORDER ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 67013860 PROPOSED ORDER |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXHIBITS DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 23, 2021 IPA ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 66954179 EXHIBITS |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MISCELLANEOUS - STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT (MICHAEL C. HEYDEN) DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 8, 2021 PETITION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF PURCHASE OF SETRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS PURSUANT TO 10 DELAWARE CODE SECTION 6601 TRANSFER AGREEMENT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT NOTICE TO INTERESTED PARTIES OF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 15, 2021 @ 11 AM PROPOSED ORDER ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 66908658 MISC-STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MISCELLANEOUS - STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 8, 2021 PETITION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF PURCHASE OF SETRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS PURSUANT TO 10 DELAWARE CODE SECTION 6601 TRANSFER AGREEMENT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT NOTICE TO INTERESTED PARTIES OF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 15, 2021 @ 11 AM PROPOSED ORDER ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 66908658 MISC-STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.