Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Structured Settlement case in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with CONNER, MARK H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONNER, MARK H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryStructured Settlement |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 19, 2021 NOTICE |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
CIVIL MOTION HEARD ON 9-17-21 - MMT JUDGE MARK H. CONNER PRESIDING - PETITION FOR STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT WAS GRANTED - MS. LACKFORD WAS PRESENT DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 MOTION GRANTED |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 18, 2021 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE MARK H. CONNER ON 9-17-21. IT IS ORDERED THAT THE PETITION FOR STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT IS GRANTED. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66941696 ORDER SIGNED/GRANTED (MISC) |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ACTION FORM DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 18, 2021 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM FROM CIVIL MOTION HEARD ON 9-17-21 ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66941621 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 PROPOSED ORDER ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66937063 PROPOSED ORDER |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 16, 2021 RE-NOTICE OF PETITION FOR PARTIAL TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO THE STRUCTURED SETTLEMENTS ACT, 10 DEL. C. 6601, ET SEQ. TO BE HEARD ON FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 11:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66932731 RE-NOTICE |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
CIVIL MOTION SCHEDULED FOR 9-17-21 WAS REMOVED FROM THE CALENDAR / WAS RE-NOTICED - MMT DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 14, 2021 MOTION REMOVED FROM CALENDAR |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 15, 2021 RE-NOTICE OF PETITION FOR PARTIAL TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO THE STRUCTURED SETTLEMENTS ACT, 10 DEL. C. 6601, ET. SEQ. TO BE HEARD ON FRIDAY, OCTOBER 1, 2021 AT 11:00 A.M. (THIS WAS NOT SCHEDULED AS THEY PUT THE MOTION BACK ON FOR 9-17-21) ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66930462 RE-NOTICE |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MISC. - STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT - MMT (PHILIP T. EDWARDS) DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 27, 2021 PETITION FOR PARTIAL TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO THE STRUCTURED SETTLEMENTS ACT, 1O DEL C. 6601, ET SEQ. NOTICE OF PETITION FOR PARTIAL TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO THE STRUCTURED SETTLEMENTS ACT, 1O DEL C. 6601, ET SEQ. TO BE HEARD ON FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 11:00 A.M. EXHIBIT 1 - COPY OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT EXHIBIT 2 - STATEMENT OF INDEPENDENT PROFESSIONAL ADVICE EXHIBIT 3 - PURCHASE AGREEMENT AND DISCLOSURE STATEMENT EXHIBIT 4 - WRITTEN NOTICE OF TRANSFEREE'S NAMES, ADDRESS AND TAXPAYER IDENTIFICATION NUMBER EXHIBIT 5 - NOTICE TO INTERESTED PARTIES EXHIBIT 6 - AFFIDAVIT OF PAYEE CERTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FOR TRANSFEREE VERFICATION SIGNED BY VICE PRESIDENT OF PETITIONER PROPOSED ORDER CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66882655 MISC-STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.