Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with 004139 presiding.
Case Number |
Judge004139 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryMortgage Mediation |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - GGM DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 28, 2022 NOTICE |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - CLOSED DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 27, 2022 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DUE TO LOSS MITIGATION. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67507939 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 17, 2021 LETTER FROM MELANIE J. THOMPSON, ESQUIRE, TO JUDICIAL CASE MANAGER. RE: PLAINTIFF'S STATUS UPDATE. CLIENT HAS PLACED ABOVE FILE ON A COVID-19 FORECLOSURE MORATORIUM HOLD. PLAINTIFF CANNOT PROCEED WITH ANY ACTION UNTIL HOLD HAS BEEN REMOVED. PLAINTIFF REQUESTS ADDITIONAL TIME UNTIL MAY 31, 2022 TO PROVIDE AN ADDITIONAL STATUS OR PROCEED WITH SERVICE OF THE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67100077 LETTER |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
CHECK (#641193 - $30.00) RETURNED TO ORLANS PC VIA MAIL DUE TO INCORRECT AMOUNT AND CASE CURRENTLY ON HOLD, PER SHIRLEY HARRIS - MS - EMAIL ON 9/23 FROM SHIRLEY NOTES STILL ON HOLD DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 8, 2021 NOTICE |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE MEDIATION (IN REM) (MELANIE THOMPSON / JOHN E. TARBURTON) DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 17, 2021 INIT FILING MORTGAGE MEDIATION |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 17, 2021 COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT AS TO DEFENDANTS' NON-MILITARY STATUS CIVIL CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE SUMMONS - SUSSEX COUNTY SHERIFF AFFIDAVIT IN COMPLIANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-1 EXHIBIT A - NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE MEDIATION EXHIBIT B - CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION PARTICIPATION EXHIBIT C - UNIVERSAL INTAKE FORM EXHIBIT D - FORECLOSURE INTERVENTION CHECK-LIST EXHIBIT E - CERTIFIED MORTGAGE, NOTE, RECORDED ASSIGNMENT EXHIBIT F - FAIR DEBT COLLECTION PRACTICES LETTERS EXHIBIT G - AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH 5062D(B) AND STATEMENT OF AMOUNTS DUE EXHIBIT H - 5062D(B)(1) NOTICE OF INTENT AFFIDAVIT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66851115 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE MEDIATION DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 17, 2021 INIT FILING MORTGAGE MEDIATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.