Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with CONNER, MARK H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONNER, MARK H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: JULY 3, 2023 NOTICE |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 28, 2023 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE MARK H. CONNER ON 6-27-23. IT IS ORDERED THAT ALL CLAIMS IN THIS CASE ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 70270444 ORDER |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 27, 2023 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 70258013 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 6-20-23 WAS REMOVED FROM THE CALENDAR / SETTLED PRIOR TO TRIAL - MMT (PER MEDIATOR SAVILLE'S EMAIL) DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 13, 2023 TRL SCHD: SETTLED PRIOR TRIAL |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 5-18-23 WAS REMOVED FROM THE CALENDAR / SETTLED - MMT DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 13, 2023 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 13, 2023 LETTER FROM MARGARET THATCHER TO COUNSEL RE: THE COURT BEING NOTIFIED THE CASE HAS SETTLED AND IN ORDER FOR THE COURT TO CLOSE ITS CASE A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL MUST BE FILED WITHIN 60 DAYS OR THE COURT WILL CLOSE THE CASE WITH PREJUDICE. (MEDIATOR SAVILLE'S EMAIL ATTACHED) ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 69796340 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 30, 2022 DEFENDANT, TWO FARMS, INC.'S WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY RESPONSE TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 67777332 NOTICE |
|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
CIVIL MOTION SCHEDULED FOR 7-1-22 WAS REMOVED FROM THE CALENDAR / PER ATTORNEY ABBOTT'S EMAIL IT WILL BE WITHDRAWN - MMT DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 29, 2022 MOTION REMOVED FROM CALENDAR |
|
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 28, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 67766967 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 3, 2022 DEFENDANT, TWO FARMS, INC.'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 67684935 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.