Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with ROBINSON JR., ROBERT H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBINSON JR., ROBERT H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 7, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE ROBERT H. ROBINSON, JR. ON MAY 6, 2022. IT IS ORDERED THAT THIS MATTER SHALL BE SUBMITTED TO A BINDING ARBITRATOR AND SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE ARBITRATION, THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OR A STATUS LETTER ADVISING WHY THE CASE CANNOT BE DISMISSED AT THAT TIME. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67596471 ORDER |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION TO BINDING ARBITRATION DATE DOCKETED: MAY 4, 2022 STIPULATION TO ARBITRATE AND SET PARAMETERS FOR RECOVERY. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 67576432 STIPULATION TO BINDING ARB |
|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 23, 2022 LETTER FROM YVONNE T. SAVILLE, MEDIATOR, TO COUNSEL. RE: INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM ARBITRATOR SETTING BINDING ARBITRATION HEARING DATE FOR TUESDAY, JULY 21, 2022, AT 10:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 67498944 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
VACATION OF DEPOSITION DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 12, 2022 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE TO VACATE DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT BETTY J. ANDERSON SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 11, 2022 ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 67386547 VACATION OF DEPOSITION |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
VACATION OF DEPOSITION DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 12, 2022 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF KELLY L. HALLIDAY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 11, 2022 ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 67385358 VACATION OF DEPOSITION |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 26, 2022 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67346031 NOTICE SRV ANS INTERROGATORIES |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 18, 2022 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67323372 NOTICE SRV RSP RQST PRODUCTION |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 18, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE ROBERT H. ROBINSON, JR. FEBRUARY 17, 2022. IT IS ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PURSUANT TO RULE 37, IS HEREBY GRANTED, AND DEFENDANT IS COMPELLED TO PROVIDE ANSWERS TO OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY BY FEBRUARY 28, 2022. FURTHER; THE HEARING PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED TO BE HELD FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 18, 2022, IS HEREBY REMOVED FROM THE COURT'S CALENDAR. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67325631 ORDER |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 18, 2022 LETTER FROM PATRICK G. ROCK, ESQUIRE, TO JUDGE ROBINSON. RE: DEFENSE COUNSEL DOES NOT OPPOSE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND REQUESTS THE ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO PRODUCE ANSWERS TO DISCOVERY BY FEBRUARY 28, 2022. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67323499 LETTER |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
CIVIL MOTION SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 18, 2022 - MS REMOVED FROM CALENDAR. ORDER SIGNED PRIOR TO HEARNG. DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 17, 2022 MOTION REMOVED FROM CALENDAR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.