Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with CONNER, MARK H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONNER, MARK H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 24, 2022 NOTICE |
|
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 22, 2022 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 67331272 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 2, 2021 WRIT RETURNED. SERVED KATHLEEN A. CHALMERS PERSONALLY ON 8-27-21. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66888662 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 21, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED TO KENT COUNTY SHERIFF FOR SERVICE ON KATHLEEN A. CHALMERS ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66869573 WRIT ISSUED |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 17, 2021 COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT OF COUNSEL PURSUANT TO RULE 3(H)(II) AND (III) AFFIDAVIT OF TAYLOR E. TRAPP, ESQUIRE TO ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES PRAECIPE SUMMONS - KENT COUNTY SHERIFF EXHIBIT A - POLICE REPORT CIVIL CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66853228 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING PERSONAL INJURY AUTO - MMT (COUNTS I & II) (TAYLOR E. TRAPP) DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 17, 2021 INIT FILING PERS INJURY AUTO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.