Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BUTLER, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUTLER, CHARLES E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2023 |
CategoryMortgage Mediation |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 19, 2023 NOW COMES THE PLAINTIFF, BY AND THROUGH ITS COUNSEL, AND HEREBY ASKS THIS HONORABLE COURT TO DISMISS THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE DUE TO REINSTATEMENT OF LOAN. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69842308 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 18, 2023 WRIT RETURNED PERSONALLY SERVED BARBARA E BROWN AKA BARBARA ELIZABETH BROWN ON 03-10-2023 09:00 ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69329574 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 4, 2023 1 WRIT ISSUED FOR NCC CHK#654185 $30.00 ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69263659 WRIT ISSUED |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE MEDIATION DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 11, 2023 INIT FILING MORTGAGE MEDIATION |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 11, 2023 COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT AND SCRA SEARCHES AS TO NON-MILITARY STATUS OF DEFENDANTS CIVIL CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE SUMMONS NEW CASTLE COUNTY SHERIFF AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-1 EXHIBIT A - MORTGAGE, NOTE, RECORDED ASSIGNMENTS EXHIBIT B - FDCPA LETTER EXHIBIT C - AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF AMOUNTS DUE EXHIBIT D NOTICE OF INTENT AFFIDAVIT MMED EXHIBIT A NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE MEDIATION MMED EXHIBIT B - CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION PARTICIPATION MMED EXHIBIT C - UNIVERSAL INTAKE FORM MMED EXHIBIT D - FORECLOSURE INTERVENTION CHECK-LIST ACCEPTED BY: LV TRANSACTION ID: 69124305 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.