Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lakeview Loan Servicing, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Blythe, Darlene W, Di Lorenzo, Catherine M, against Brackin, Kristin M, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BUTLER, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUTLER, CHARLES E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2023 |
CategoryMortgage Mediation |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 29, 2023 WRIT OF LEVARI FACIAS ISSUED WITH CHECK TO THE NEW CASTLE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE ON SEPTEMBER 29 2023 ACCEPTED BY: MLM TRANSACTION ID: 70982370 WRIT ISSUED |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF LEVARI FACIAS DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 22, 2023 LEVARI FACIAS PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 70917094 LEVARI FACIAS |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 31, 2023 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: KRISTIN M. BRACKIN JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: TOTAL DEBT DUE: $246,869.15 TO INCLUDE IN THE JUDGMENT INTEREST TO DATE OF CONFIRMATION, ESCROW ADVANCES TO DATE OF CONFIRMATION, REASONABLE COUNSEL FEES AS PROVIDED IN THE MORTGAGE, COSTS, AND ALL OTHER SUMS NOW DUE OR THAT MAY BECOME DUE UNDER THE MORTGAGE. TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT= $246869.15 DIRECTION TO ENTER FULL DEFAULT JUDGMENT LOSS MITIGATION AFFIDAVIT JUDGMENT AFFIDAVIT OF CATHERINE DI LORENZO AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 70744312 DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF MAILING AND POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 4(F)(4) FILED DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 31, 2023 RULE 4F4 AFFIDAVIT OF CATHERINE DI LORENZO NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS MAIL RECEIPTS USPS RETURNS POSTING AFFIDAVIT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 70744249 PROOF OF MAILING RULE 4(F)(4) |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
FINAL MORTGAGE MEDIATION RECORD DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 14, 2023 FINAL MEDIATION RECORD. THE MEDIATION PROCESS WAS UNSUCCESSFUL BECAUSE THE PARTIES FAILED TO COME TO AGREEMENT. THE FORECLOSURE ACTION MAY PROCEED. MEDIATION FEE: NOT REQUIRED. ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 70187579 FINAL MEDIATION RECORD |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING MORTGAGE MEDIATION RECORD DATE DOCKETED: MAY 12, 2023 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD. AN ADDITIONAL VIRTUAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 7, 2023 AT 10:30 A.M. MEDIATION FEE: DUE BUT NOT PAID. ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69996946 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 28, 2023 MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE. A VIRTUAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR MAY 3, 2023 AT 9:30 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: TNW TRANSACTION ID: 69649513 MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 14, 2023 WRIT RETURNED SERVED UPON AND LEFT PERSONALLY UPON KRISTIN M BRACKIN AT 239 ACADEMY LANE MIDDLETOWN, DE 19709 , ON 2/7/2023 AT 10:35 AM A COPY OF SCIRE FACIAS SUR MORTGAGE ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69107132 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 4, 2023 1 WRIT ISSUED FOR NCC CHK#33998 $30.00 ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69073108 WRIT ISSUED |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE INTERVENTION COUNSELING CLIENTS CHECKLIST DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 18, 2023 EXHIBIT D - CHECKLIST ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 68901747 FORECLOSURE INTERV CHECKLIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.