Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BUTLER, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUTLER, CHARLES E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2023 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 3, 2023 ORDER SIGNED BY: BUTLER, CHARLES E TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. TRIAL- 06-25-25; PRETRIAL CONFERENCE-05-23-25 AT 11:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 70530855 SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW DATE DOCKETED: JULY 29, 2023 TRIAL AVAILABILITY ACCEPTED BY: TNW TRANSACTION ID: 70500218 LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 1, 2023 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 70098370 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 2, 2023 ORDER SIGNED BY: BUTLER, CHARLES E COURT'S TRIAL AVAILABILITY LETTER. ACCEPTED BY: BH TRANSACTION ID: 69918877 LETTER |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (FIRST) DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 18, 2023 REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT ACCEPTED BY: TNW TRANSACTION ID: 69829051 REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (1ST) |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 18, 2023 PLAINTIFF INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT ACCEPTED BY: TNW TRANSACTION ID: 69829051 DISCOVERY |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 15, 2023 WRIT RETURNED-PERSONALLY SERVED 04-04-2023 08:54 KIDANY LUGO ACCEPTED BY: NG TRANSACTION ID: 69761634 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
REFERRED TO CASE SCHEDULING DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 6, 2023 REFERRED TO CASE SCHEDULING |
|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 22, 2023 1 WRIT ISSUED FOR NCCC CHK#10093 $30.00 ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69602961 WRIT ISSUED |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 15, 2023 DEFENDANT, KIDANY LUGO'S ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF MICHAEL R. ABBOTT, ESQUIRE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69329803 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.