Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Middlebrook, Nikerray, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dolan, Sean A, Roseman, Kenneth M, against Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Root Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BUTLER, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUTLER, CHARLES E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2023 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 9, 2023 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF NIKERRAY MIDDLEBROOK ON AUGUST 15, 2023 BEGINNING AT 10:00 AM. WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 70151051 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 3, 2023 ORDER SIGNED BY: BUTLER, CHARLES E TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. TRIAL 09-16-24; PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - 08-16-24 @ 2:30 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69917499 SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 1, 2023 COUNSEL'S JOINT RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S TRIAL AVAILABLITY LETTER ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69706564 RESPONSE |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 30, 2023 ORDER SIGNED BY: BUTLER, CHARLES E COURT'S TRIAL AVAILABILITY LETTER. ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69680481 LETTER |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 21, 2023 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY RESPONSES DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69588708 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
REFERRED TO CASE SCHEDULING DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 10, 2023 REFERRED TO CASE SCHEDULING |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 11, 2023 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT FOR DEFENDANT PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: TNW TRANSACTION ID: 69299405 ANSWER |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 10, 2023 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69300348 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 3, 2023 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69259645 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 24, 2023 SEAN A. DOLAN, ESQUIRE ENTERS HIS APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANT PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69199203 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.