Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BUTLER, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUTLER, CHARLES E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2023 |
CategoryDebt / Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MAY 4, 2023 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69943194 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 4, 2023 WRIT RETURNED NON EST INVENTUS I HAVE MADE DILIGENT SEARCH FOR THE WITHIN-NAMED NIQUANA S WHITE AND FOR HIS/HER/ITS LAST AND USUAL PLACE OF ABODE/LOCATION, 35 CHESWOLD BLVD APT 3D NEWARK, DE 19713 WITH AND FOR HIS TENANT, AGENT, OR ATTORNEY, BUT COULD NOT FIND HIM/HER/IT WITHIN THIS COUNTY; I THEREFORE RETURN THIS WRIT WITHOUT SERVICE. ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69213555 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 14, 2023 1 WRIT ISSUED FOR NCC CHK#21959 $30.00 ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69136325 WRIT ISSUED |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED ON DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 7, 2023 ALIAS PRAECIPE ALIAS SUMMONS ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69046699 ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 26, 2023 WRIT RETURNED- NON EST INVENTUS NON EST INVENTUS 01-24-2023 10:59 NIQUANA S WHITE ACCEPTED BY: NG TRANSACTION ID: 68985067 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 12, 2023 1 WRIT ISSUED FOR NCC CHK#21920 $30.00 ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 68859579 WRIT ISSUED |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DEBT / BREACH OF CONTRACT DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 6, 2023 INIT FILING DEBT/BREACH CONT |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 6, 2023 COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE SUMMONS EXHIBIT A - CONTRACT EXHIBIT B - DEMAND LETTERS ACCEPTED BY: JDB TRANSACTION ID: 68806153 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.