Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BUTLER, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUTLER, CHARLES E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 19, 2022 |
CategoryMortgage Mediation |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 17, 2022 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE, JUDGES SIGNATURE REQUIRED. ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 68625857 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 17, 2022 NON EST INVENTUS NON EST INVENTUS 11-18-2022 10:24 JERMAINE GOINS ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 68505535 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 16, 2022 1 WRIT ISSUED FOR NCC CHK#29811 $40.00 ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 68388179 WRIT ISSUED |
|
November 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF MAILING AND POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 4(F)(4) FILED DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 15, 2022 AFFIDAVIT OF JANET Z. CHARLTON, ESQUIRE - PROOF OF MAILING - RULE 4(F)(4) EXHIBIT A - NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS EXHIBIT B - CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS EXHIBIT C - UNCLAIMED ENVELOPES AND USPS TRACKING INFORMATION EXHIBIT D - AFFIDAVIT OF POSTING ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 68377457 PROOF OF MAILING RULE 4(F)(4) |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED ON DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 5, 2022 ALIAS PRAECIPE ALIAS SUMMONS - NCC SHERIFF ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 68351430 ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED |
|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 3, 2022 WRIT RETURNED NON EST INVENTUS BY VIRTUE OF THIS WRIT I HAVE MADE DILIGENT SEARCH FOR THE WITHIN-NAMED JERMAINE GOINS AND FOR HIS/HER/ITS LAST AND USUAL PLACE OF ABODE/LOCATION, 5 FOLS CRESCENT ROAD NEW CASTE, DE 19720 WITH AND FOR HIS TENANT, AGENT, OR ATTORNEY, BUT COULD NOT FIND HIM/HER/IT WITHIN THIS COUNTY; I THEREFORE RETURN THIS WRIT WITHOUT SERVICE. ON DATE: 10/31/2022 @ 3:00 PM - 5 FOLS CRESCENT ROAD NEW CASTE, DE 19720 ATTEMPTED BY: JERMAINE RICHARDSON ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 68330924 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 29, 2022 1 WRIT ISSUED FOR NCC CHK 29771 $30.00 ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 68320673 WRIT ISSUED |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 20, 2022 COMPLAINT CIS PRAECIPE SUMMONS EXHIBIT A - NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE MEDIATION EXHIBIT B - CERTIFICATE OF PARTICIPATION EXHIBIT C - UNIVERSAL INTAKE FORM EXHIBIT D - FORECLOSURE INTERVENTION CHECKLIST EXHIBIT E - MORTGAGE EXHIBIT F - ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE EXHIBIT G - FAIR DEBT EXHIBIT H - AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE ACCEPTED BY: LV TRANSACTION ID: 68272330 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE MEDIATION DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 20, 2022 INIT FILING MORTGAGE MEDIATION |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT FILED DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 20, 2022 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-1 ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 68273813 AFFIDAVIT FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.