Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Brown, Sheree Nicole, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Levering, Walter David, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with HERLIHY, JEROME O presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHERLIHY, JEROME O Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 18, 2013 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 21, 2013 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 52929173 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
June 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 20, 2013 ALIAS WRIT RETURNED ON 6-19-13 - SERVED WALTER DAVID LEVERING BY LEAVING A COPY WITH MICHELLE SPAULDING, FIANCE, ON 6-17-13 ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 52912855 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 13, 2013 (1) ALIAS WRIT ISSUED ON 6-12-13 ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 52795423 WRIT ISSUED |
|
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED ON DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 7, 2013 ALIAS PRAECIPE ALIAS SUMMONS ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 52635605 ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED |
|
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MAY 14, 2013 WRIT RETURNED ON 5-10-13 - NON EST AS TO WALTER DAVID LEVERING ON 5-9-13: PER FEMALE CALLER STATES NO LONGER RESIDES HERE-CHECKED DELJIS (UPDATED 7-13-12) TRY: 614 LOVEVILLE E1C COFFEE RUN, HOCKESSIN DE 19707 ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 52251788 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: MAY 3, 2013 (1) WRIT ISSUED ON 4-30-13 ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 52078037 WRIT ISSUED |
|
April 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 19, 2013 COMPLAINT FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE SUMMONS ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 51846694 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
April 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING PERSONAL INJURY AUTO DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 19, 2013 INIT FILING PERS INJURY AUTO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.