Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Torres, Esther, Torres, Jorge L, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nitsche, Gary S, against Howell, Darrell M, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with HERLIHY, JEROME O presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHERLIHY, JEROME O Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 06, 2013 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 16, 2013 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 51781713 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 13, 2013 (1) WRIT ISSUED ON 3-11-13 ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 50924854 WRIT ISSUED |
|
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 7, 2013 PLAINTIFFS TORRES COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS TORRES CIS PLAINTIFFS TORRES SUMMONS PLAINTIFFS TORRES PRAECIPE PLAINTIFFS TORRES FORM 30S PLAINTIFFS TORRES EXHIBIT (POLICE REPORT) TO BE ATTACHED TO FORM 30S PLAINTIFFS TORRES RULE 3H ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 49945882 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING PERSONAL INJURY AUTO DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 7, 2013 INIT FILING PERS INJURY AUTO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.