Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wowoah, Precious, Wowoah, Matthew, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Healy, Kevin G, against Progressive Direct Insurance Co, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with HERLIHY, JEROME O presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHERLIHY, JEROME O Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2012 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
COURT DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MAY 2, 2013 ORDER SIGNED BY: HERLIHY, JEROME O SO ORDERED - COURT DISMISSAL (STALL LETTER SENT TO COUNSEL REQUESTING THAT A RESPONSE AS TO THE STATUS OF THE CASE BE FILED BY 4-26-13) ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 52068996 COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL |
|
April 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
STALL LETTER SENT TO COUNSEL REQUESTING THAT A RESPONSE AS TO THE STATUS OF THE CASE BE FILED BY 4-26-13 ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 51688605 STATUS CASE LETTER |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 18, 2013 WRIT RETURNED ON 1-17-13 - SERVED PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY BY LEAVING A COPY WITH INSURANCE COMMISSIONER KAREN WELDIN-STEWART ON 1-8-13 ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 48997213 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 3, 2013 (2) WRITS ISSUED ON 12-19-12 ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 48708031 WRIT ISSUED |
|
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING PERSONAL INJURY AUTO DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 15, 2012 INIT FILING PERS INJURY AUTO |
|
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 15, 2012 COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE SUMMONS PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES AFFIDAVIT OF COUNSEL ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 48412360 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.