Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Christopher, Marconi filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with HERLIHY, JEROME O presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHERLIHY, JEROME O Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2012 |
CategoryUnemployment Insurance Board |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 13, 2013 APPELLANT'S VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED CONVENTIONALLY IN THE NCC PROTHONOTARY ON 03-11-13 ACCEPTED BY: LDL TRANSACTION ID: 50889868 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 28, 2013 LETTER DATED 02-27-13 FROM L. LAVALLEE TO APPELLEE RE: REPRESENTATION. ACCEPTED BY: LDL TRANSACTION ID: 49825851 LETTER |
|
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
BRIEF SCHEDULE FILED AND ISSUED AS FOLLOWS: OPENING BRIEF DUE: ANSWERING BRIEF DUE: REPLY BRIEF DUE: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 28, 2013 BRIEFING SCHEDULE ISSUED AS FOLLOWS: OPENING BRIEF DUE: MARCH 19, 2013; ANSWERING BRIEF DUE: APRIL 8, 2013; REPLY BRIEF DUE: APRIL 22, 2013 ACCEPTED BY: LDL TRANSACTION ID: 49825773 BRIEF SCHEDULE FILED |
|
February 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
RECORD AND TRANSCRIPT FROM: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 27, 2013 RECORD AND TRANSCRIPT FROM THE U.I.A.B. FILED CONVENTIONALLY IN THE NCC PROTHONOTARY ON 02-25-13 ACCEPTED BY: LDL TRANSACTION ID: 49812170 RECORD & TRANSCRIPT (LOWER CT) |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 20, 2012 LETTER DATED 12-11-12 FROM S. AGNEW TO APPELLEE WITH CASE INFORMATION ACCEPTED BY: LDL TRANSACTION ID: 48509184 LETTER |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 20, 2012 2 WRITS ISSUED ON 12-12-12 FOR SERVICE ON THE U.I.A.B. - CERT. MAIL SENT TO EVERGREEN WASTE SERVICES 7011 0470 0002 3611 2546 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 48509289 WRIT ISSUED |
|
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE APPEAL BOARD DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 20, 2012 NOTICE OF APPEAL -U.I.A.B. PRO SE FILED CONVENTIONALLY IN THE NCC PROTHONOTARY ON 12-10-12 PRAECIPE FOR SERVICE CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT ACCEPTED BY: LDL TRANSACTION ID: 48508745 INIT FILING UNEMP INS APPL BRD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.