We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Closed: Heather Rose V. Heidelberg Usa, Inc.

Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago ago

On December 08, 2021 a Issuance Subpoena case was filed in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE.

Case Details

Filing Date

December 08, 2021

Last Refreshed

December 14, 2021

Filing Location

New Castle County, DE

Category

Issuance Subpoena

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event INITIAL FILING MISCELLANEOUS - ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 9, 2021 PETITION FOR ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA FILED CONVENTIONALLY IN NCC PROTHONOTARY ON DECEMBER 2, 2021 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67151587
MISC-ISSUANCE OF A SUBPOENA
Docket Event SIMULTANEOUS DISPOSED WITH FILING DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 9, 2021 ONE SUBPOENA ISSUED TO C FLINTKOTE WILMINGTON DE, ON DECEMBER 6, 2021. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67151587
SIMULTAEOUS DISPOSED W/ FILING
See all events

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.