Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Issuance Subpoena case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with SCU7UNASJ presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCU7UNASJ Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 01, 2021 |
CategoryIssuance Subpoena |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 23, 2021 REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 11-19-2021 15:00 BANK OF AMERICA, NA ACCEPTED BY: TNW TRANSACTION ID: 67113951 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
SIMULTANEOUS DISPOSED WITH FILING DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 2, 2021 ONE SUBPOENA ISSUED TO C BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. WILMINGTON DE, ON OCTOBER 29, 2021. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67058883 SIMULTAEOUS DISPOSED W/ FILING |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MISCELLANEOUS - ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 2, 2021 PETITION FOR ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA FILED CONVENTIONALLY IN NCC PROTHONOTARY ON OCTOBER 26, 2021 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67058883 MISC-ISSUANCE OF A SUBPOENA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.