Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2021 |
CategoryDivision Of Revenue Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: JULY 15, 2022 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: ND TRANSACTION ID: 67820694 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
GARNISHMENT ISSUED TO EMPLOYER (DOR) DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 23, 2022 GARNISHMENT-KALENE A GARRISON ACCEPTED BY: ND TRANSACTION ID: 67499649 GARNISHMENT ISSUED EMPLOYER |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DIVISION OF REVENUE (DOR) SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 8, 2021 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: KALENE A GARRISON JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $29.89 INIT FILING DIV OF REVENUE |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 8, 2021 DIVISION OF REVENUE JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 67147566 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.