Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2021 |
CategoryForeign Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAILED CAROL HELMICH AN ATTACHMENT FIFA PACKET AND HER CHECK BACK TO FILL OUT THE PAPERWORK ON 12-9-2021 DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 8, 2021 NOTICE |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 8, 2021 FOREIGN JUDGMENT LETTER MAILED TO NELSON CASH ON 12-8-2021 ACCEPTED BY: J TRANSACTION ID: 67147672 LETTER |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 8, 2021 FOREIGN JUDGMENT LETTER MAILED TO LISA FERRON ON 12-8-2021 ACCEPTED BY: J TRANSACTION ID: 67147672 LETTER |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING FOREIGN JUDGMENTS SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 7, 2021 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED JOINT AND SEVERAL AGAINST: NELSON CASH LISA FERRON JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $3000.00 INIT FILING FOREIGN JUDGMENTS |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 7, 2021 CAROL HELMICH VS NELSON CASH, LISA FERRON ACCEPTED BY: J TRANSACTION ID: 67145712 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.