Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Yh Lex Estates Llc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Murphy, Kathleen A, against Meir, Nir, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 16, 2021 |
CategoryForeign Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 20, 2021 FILING OF CONFIRMING RECEIPT IN JUDGMENT ACTION EXHIBIT A - FEDEX TRACKING INFORMATION CONFIRMING RECEIPT ACCEPTED BY: KZ TRANSACTION ID: 67110396 NOTICE |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT FILED DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 20, 2021 AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING TO COUNSEL ACCEPTED BY: KZ TRANSACTION ID: 67111928 AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 18, 2021 FOREIGN JUDGMENT LETTER MAILED TO DEFENDANT ON 11-18-2021 ACCEPTED BY: J TRANSACTION ID: 67104794 LETTER |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING FOREIGN JUDGMENTS SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 17, 2021 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: NIR MEIR JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $19742959.81 INIT FILING FOREIGN JUDGMENTS |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 17, 2021 JUDGMENT ENTERED BY SUPREME COURT OF NEW YORK, COUNTY OF NEW YORK AFFIDAVIT OF JUDGMENT CREDITOR PURSUANT TO 10 DEL. C. 4783(A) ACCEPTED BY: KZ TRANSACTION ID: 67097771 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 17, 2021 AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING PURSUANT TO 10 DEL. C. 4783(B) NOTICE OF FILING ACCEPTED BY: KZ TRANSACTION ID: 67098255 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.