Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with MEDINILLA, VIVIAN L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMEDINILLA, VIVIAN L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED/GRANTED (MISCELLANEOUS CASES) DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 16, 2023 ORDER SIGNED/GRANTED (MISC) |
|
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 21, 2023 NO RESPONSE FROM THE PLAINTIFFS HAVING BEEN RECEIVED IN RESPONSE TO THE ABOVE, IT IS SO ORDERED THIS CASE IS DISMISSED ON THIS 17TH DAY OF FEBRUARY, 2023. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 69180457 ORDER |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 18, 2023 IT APPEARS THAT THIS MATTER CANNOT PRESENTLY PROCEED BECAUSE SERVICE OF PROCESS OR AN ANSWER IS LACKING. PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL MUST REPORT BACK TO THE COURT ON THE STATUS OF THIS CASE WITHIN 15 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS NOTICE. AT THE DIRECTION OF JUDGE VIVIAN L. MEDINILLA, FAILURE BY PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL TO COMPLY WITH THIS LETTER MAY RESULT IN THE COURT DEEMING DISMISSAL OF THIS CASE AS UNOPPOSED AND THE COURT MAY DISMISS THIS ACTION WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE TO THE PLAINTIFF. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 68902341 LETTER |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 15, 2022 PLAINTIFF'S STATUS LETTER TO JUDGE MEDINILLA TO RESPOND TO COURT'S LETTER OF MARCH 30, 2022. ACCEPTED BY: L TRANSACTION ID: 67476676 LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
STALL LETTER SENT TO COUNSEL ON 3-30-20 REQUESTING A THE STATUS OF THIS CASE WITHIN 15 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS NOTICE, OR ON OR BY APRIL 21, 2022 ACCEPTED BY: SR TRANSACTION ID: 67438249 STATUS CASE LETTER |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 20, 2022 NEW CASTLE COUNTY SHERIFF PERSONALLY SERVED LAVON R. GOTT ON 1-5-2022 ACCEPTED BY: MKT TRANSACTION ID: 67213823 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 5, 2022 WRIT ISSUED TO NEW CASTLE COUNTY SHERIFF (#9723 - $30) ON 12-30-2021 ACCEPTED BY: MKT TRANSACTION ID: 67205464 WRIT ISSUED |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING PERSONAL INJURY AUTO DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 11, 2021 INIT FILING PERS INJURY AUTO |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 11, 2021 COMPLAINT COLEMAN JR. CIS PLAINTIFF COLEMAN JR. FORM 30 COLEMAN JR. PRAECIPE GOTT SUMMONS GOTT COLEMAN JR 3H STATEMENT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67152329 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.