Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Whetzel, Richard L., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Currier, Anna E, Gibson, Patrick K, Gorman Iii, James G, Hubbard, Antoinette D, Silverman, Michael I, (total of 5) See All against National Railroad Passenger Corp, Penn Central Corporation, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with MEDINILLA, VIVIAN L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMEDINILLA, VIVIAN L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 16, 2023 LETTER TO J. MEDINILLA REQUESTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ACCEPTED BY: SJ TRANSACTION ID: 70641300 LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: JULY 27, 2023 MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY IS GRANTED. SO ORDERED THIS 26TH DAY OF JULY, 2023. ACCEPTED BY: SJ TRANSACTION ID: 70485836 ORDER |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION GRANTED DATE DOCKETED: JULY 26, 2023 MOTION GRANTED |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 28, 2023 NOTICE OF MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY TO BE PRESENTED TO THE HONORABLE VIVIAN L. MEDINILLA ON MONDAY, AUGUST 1, 2023 AT 9:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: SJ TRANSACTION ID: 70265248 NOTICE |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 27, 2023 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE A PARTY EX 1 EX 2 EX 3 EX 4 EX 5 EX 6 PROPOSED ORDER CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: SJ TRANSACTION ID: 70254530 MOTION |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUGGESTION OF DEATH DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 28, 2023 DEFENDANT AMERICAN PREMIER UNDERWRITERS, INC.'S SUGGESTION OF DEATH OF PLAINTIFF RICHARD L. WHETZEL CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT AMERICAN PREMIER UNDERWRITERS, INC.'S SUGGESTION OF DEATH OF PLAINTIFF RICHARD L. WHETZEL ACCEPTED BY: JH TRANSACTION ID: 69656367 SUGGESTION OF DEATH |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 31, 2023 ORDER SIGNED BY: MEDINILLA, VIVIAN L SO ORDERED (STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING TRIAL SCHEDULING) ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 69022619 ORDER |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 31, 2023 STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING TRIAL SCHEDULING ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 69018103 STIPULATION |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 26, 2023 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ANTOINETTE D. HUBBARD, ESQ. AND ONOFRIO DE GENNARO, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 68993260 NOTICE |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 26, 2023 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 68985819 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.