Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Phillips, Bryan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Silverman, Michael I, against Progressive Direct Insurance, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with DAVIS, ERIC M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAVIS, ERIC M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 14, 2023 PLAINTIFF'S VOLUNTARY STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 69137732 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
41E NOTICE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 9, 2023 IN ACCORDANCE WITH SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 41(E), THIS NOTICE IS TO ADVISE YOU THAT THE ABOVE-REFERENCED ACTION HAS BEEN PENDING IN THIS COURT FOR MORE THAN SIX (6) MONTHS AND THAT NO PROCEEDINGS HAVE BEEN TAKEN THEREIN DURING THE PAST SIX (6) MONTHS. IF NO PROCEEDINGS ARE TAKEN WITHIN THE NEXT THIRTY (30) DAYS, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED BY THE COURT FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 69101785 41E NOTICE LETTER |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 14, 2022 INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM ARBITRATOR SETTING HEARING DATE FOR WEDNESDAY, JULY 6, 2022 AT 2:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: MR TRANSACTION ID: 67473694 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 24, 2022 PERSONAL SERVED 03-15-2022 10:00 PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY C O INSURANCE COMMISSIONER TRINADAD NAVARRO ACCEPTED BY: TEB TRANSACTION ID: 67419342 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 22, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY: DAVIS, ERIC M GRANTED. PLEASE SEE THE COURT'S COMMENTS ON PAGE 2. (ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR SERVICE) - DAVIS J. MARCH 21, 2022 ACCEPTED BY: MR TRANSACTION ID: 67409510 ORDER |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 18, 2022 MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR SERVICE NOTICE OF MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR SERVICE TO BE HEARD AT THE CONVENIENCE OF THE COURT. PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: MR TRANSACTION ID: 67401575 MOTION |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 2, 2022 (2) WRITS ISSUED FOR JANUARY 31, 2022 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67280166 WRIT ISSUED |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 9, 2021 COMPLAINT SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES PRAECIPE DIRECTING KENT COUNTY SHERIFF TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT AND RELATED DOCUMENTS ONTO THE DEFENDANT AT THE ADDRESS ON THE PRAECIPE SUMMONS DIRECTING THE DEFENDANT THAT THEY HAVE 20 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF SERVICE TO FILE AN ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT AND SERVE UPON PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67149132 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING PERSONAL INJURY AUTO DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 9, 2021 INIT FILING PERS INJURY AUTO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.