Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Richardson, Tajiana, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Cole, Sarah B, Elzufon, John A, Gaspero Jr, James, Hemming, Katherine L, Kingshill, Ryan D, (total of 7) See All against Bfg Wilmington Propco Iii, Llc, C.D. Smith Construction, Inc., Direct Supply, Inc., Snyder, Shane C., Snyder'S Home Improvements, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with LEGROW, ABIGAIL M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLEGROW, ABIGAIL M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
SO NOTED DATE DOCKETED: MAY 5, 2023 ORDER SIGNED BY: LEGROW, ABIGAIL M SO NOTED (LETTER TO JUDGE LEGROW RE: DEFENDANT C.D. SMITH CONSTRUCTION, INC. TAKES NO POSITION ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES AND AMEND PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT SCHEDULED TO BE HEARD ON MAY 18, 2023) ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 69954851 SO NOTED |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 29, 2023 LETTER TO JUDGE LEGROW RE: DEFENDANT C.D. SMITH CONSTRUCTION, INC. TAKES NO POSITION ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES AND AMEND PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT SCHEDULED TO BE HEARD ON MAY 18, 2023 ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 69920102 LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW |
|
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
REMOVED: CASE CONSOLIDATED DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 8, 2022 REMOVED: CASE CONSOLIDATED |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 4, 2022 EOA OF MATTHEW DONELSON, ESQUIRE OF ELFUZON, AUSTIN AND MONDELL, P.A., FOR DEFENDANT DIRECT SUPPLY INC. ACCEPTED BY: RH TRANSACTION ID: 67898208 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JULY 20, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY: LEGROW, ABIGAIL M GRANTED (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE) ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 67834693 ORDER |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW DATE DOCKETED: JULY 20, 2022 LETTER TO COURT REGARDING NO POSITION ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 67831194 LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 24, 2022 NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE SCHEDULED BEFORE THE HONORABLE JUDGE LEGROW FOR THURSDAY, JULY 21, 2022 AT 9:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: RH TRANSACTION ID: 67756298 NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 24, 2022 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACCEPTED BY: RH TRANSACTION ID: 67744797 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 15, 2022 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITHDRAWING KATHERINE L. HEMMING, ESQ. AND ENTERING JAMES GASPERO, ESQ. FOR PLAINTIFF ACCEPTED BY: RH TRANSACTION ID: 67722435 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MAY 24, 2022 NOTICE OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT DIRECT SUPPLY, INC.'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT DIRECT SUPPLY, INC.'S FIRST RFP DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF ACCEPTED BY: RH TRANSACTION ID: 67643234 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.