Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JONES JR, FRANCIS J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJONES JR, FRANCIS J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 17, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Arbitration Appeal |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JULY 13, 2022 CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER SENT TO COUNSEL ON 7-12-22; RESPONSE DUE WITHIN 60 DAYS ACCEPTED BY: NG TRANSACTION ID: 67813575 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 27, 2022 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CLAIMANT'S RESPONSES TO RESPONDENT'S DISCOVERY ACCEPTED BY: NG TRANSACTION ID: 67509069 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 8, 2022 INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR SETTING HEARING DATE FOR MONDAY, JULY 11, 2022 AT 11:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: NG TRANSACTION ID: 67459847 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 9, 2022 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CLAIMANT-APPELLANT'S DISCOVERY TO RESPONDENT-APPELLEE CLAIMANT-APPELLANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DIRECTED TO RESPONDENT-APPELLEE CLAIMANT-APPELLANT'S INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO RESPONDENT-APPELLEE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67296591 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 8, 2022 CLAIMANT'S RESPONSES TO RESPONDENT'S RULE 9(G) REQUEST ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67294423 RESPONSE |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 8, 2022 RESPONDENT'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT ON APPEAL RESPONDENT'S ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67289350 ANSWER |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 8, 2022 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONDENT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS DIRECTED TO CLAIMANT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67289350 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 24, 2021 WRIT RETURNED -PERSONAL SERVED 12-14-2021 10:00 LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY C O INSURANCE COMMISSIONER TRINADAD NAVARRO ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67188744 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 4, 2021 (2) WRITS ISSUED FOR KENT COUNTY SHERIFF ON DECEMBER 1, 2021 ACCEPTED BY: OA TRANSACTION ID: 67141461 WRIT ISSUED |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXHIBITS DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 19, 2021 TRANSCRIPT OF RECORD ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67108066 EXHIBITS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.