Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BRENNAN, DANIELLE J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRENNAN, DANIELLE J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 17, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 23, 2022 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 68422555 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 29, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY: BRENNAN, DANIELLE SO ORDERED (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE) ACCEPTED BY: RH TRANSACTION ID: 68424356 ORDER |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE SETTLED DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 11, 2022 CASE SETTLED |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
SO NOTED DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 12, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY: BRENNAN, DANIELLE SO NOTED (LETTER FROM GARY S. NITSCHE, P.A. TO THE HONORABLE JUDGE BRENNAN ADVISING OF SETTLEMENT AND STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL TO FOLLOW) ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 68231287 SO NOTED |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 8, 2022 LETTER FROM GARY S. NITSCHE, P.A. TO THE HONORABLE JUDGE BRENNAN ADVISING OF SETTLEMENT AND STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL TO FOLLOW ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 68225165 LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 4, 2022 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 67688309 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: MAY 25, 2022 DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF THE PLAINTIFF, ALEXIS ANDES CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF THE NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION BY DEFENDANT ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 67649620 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 7, 2022 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER FOR 3 DAY JURY TRIAL THAT IS TO COMMENCE ON JANUARY 30, 2023 AT 9:30AM. ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 67214812 SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
REFERRED TO CASE SCHEDULING DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 22, 2021 REFERRED TO CASE SCHEDULING |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 23, 2021 DEFENDANT WESTFALL'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT WESTFALL'S ANSWER TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF DISCOVERY TO PLAINTIFF CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR ANSWER TO COMPLAINT, ANSWER TO FORM 30S, DISCOVERY, AND CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 67186830 ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.