Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
James Jr, Angelo D, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Allen, Rachel D, Beam, Cynthia G, Nitsche, Gary S, against Astec, Inc., Rankins Iii, Jack J, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with William C. Carpenter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam C. Carpenter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 24, 2023 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL SIGNED BY BUTLER, J. ON 3-15-2023 ACCEPTED BY: NEB TRANSACTION ID: 69615427 ORDER |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 14, 2023 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL FOR JUDGE SIGNATURE ACCEPTED BY: NEB TRANSACTION ID: 69327468 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
REFERRED TO CASE SCHEDULING DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 14, 2022 REFERRED TO CASE SCHEDULING |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 7, 2022 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS VERIFICATION OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT ASTEC, INC.S SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF ACCEPTED BY: NEB TRANSACTION ID: 68520438 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 10, 2022 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT ASTEC, INC.'S SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT ASTEC, INC.'S SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (COPIES SERVED VIA LEXISNEXIS FILE & SERVEXPRESS SYSTEM) ACCEPTED BY: NEB TRANSACTION ID: 68363678 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 23, 2022 PLEASE ENTER THE APPEARANCE OF CYNTHIA G. BEAM, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF JACK J. RANKINS, III ACCEPTED BY: BH TRANSACTION ID: 68140640 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 23, 2022 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT JACK J. RANKINS, III DEFENDANT JACK J. RANKINS, III'S ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES. CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: BH TRANSACTION ID: 68140759 ANSWER |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 30, 2022 AFFIDAVID OF SERVICE FROM SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER, O'ROURKE INVESTIGATIVE. JACK J. RANKINS, III WAS PERSONALLY SERVED ON 8-25-22 AT 6:15 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: BH TRANSACTION ID: 67987668 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 24, 2022 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT ASTEC, INC.'S SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF ACCEPTED BY: BH TRANSACTION ID: 67956544 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 17, 2022 (1) ALIAS WRIT ISSUED FOR SPECIAL PROCESS SERVICE ON 8-16-22; READY FOR PICKUP AT PROTHONOTARY'S OFFICE ACCEPTED BY: AQ TRANSACTION ID: 67934840 WRIT ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.