Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with 002926 presiding.
Case Number |
Judge002926 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JULY 28, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY: WALLACE, PAUL R SO ORDERED (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE) ACCEPTED BY: JH TRANSACTION ID: 67858712 ORDER |
|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JULY 22, 2022 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: JH TRANSACTION ID: 67844128 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - PROOF OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 11, 2022 SUBPOENA TO DELAWARE STATE POLICE (SERVED ON 2-2-22) ACCEPTED BY: AQ TRANSACTION ID: 67289627 SUBPOENA - PROOF OF SERVICE |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 31, 2021 DEFENDANT, VINCENT N. LARICCIA'S, ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT DEFENDANT, VINCENT N. LARICCIA'S, ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: AQ TRANSACTION ID: 67203011 ANSWER |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 31, 2021 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, TO BE SERVED PRIVATELY. ACCEPTED BY: AQ TRANSACTION ID: 67203038 NOTICE SRV RSP REQ ADMISSION |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
REFERRED TO CASE SCHEDULING DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 30, 2021 REFERRED TO CASE SCHEDULING |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 2, 2021 NEW CASTLE COUNTY SHERIFF PERSONALLY SERVED VINCENT N. LARINCCIA ON 11-30-2021 ACCEPTED BY: MKT TRANSACTION ID: 67133890 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 25, 2021 (1) WRIT ISSUED FOR NCC ON NOVEMBER 24, 2021 ACCEPTED BY: OA TRANSACTION ID: 67123617 WRIT ISSUED |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 29, 2021 COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE SUMMONS FILING IN COMPLIANCE WITH SUPERIOR COURT RULE 3(H) PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES EXHIBIT (POLICE REPORT) TO BE ATTACHED TO ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67050938 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING PERSONAL INJURY AUTO DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 29, 2021 INIT FILING PERS INJURY AUTO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.