Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Garcia, Tammy, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Acme Market, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BUTLER, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUTLER, CHARLES E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 27, 2022 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF ANNETTE MASSEY ACCEPTED BY: TNW TRANSACTION ID: 67972360 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 27, 2022 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF JOHN FERNALD ACCEPTED BY: TNW TRANSACTION ID: 67972360 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: JULY 12, 2022 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT ACME MARKETS, INC.S EXPERT REPORT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67808507 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 28, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF KEVIN F. SHAW, ESQUIRE OF REILLY, MCDEVITT & HENRICH, P.C. ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT ACME MARKETS, INC. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67765033 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 11, 2022 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PRO HAC OF JENNIFER A. KALLET, ESQ. ACCEPTED BY: AQ TRANSACTION ID: 67712406 NOTICE |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 31, 2022 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL THE APPEARANCE OF HARRY W. SHENTON, IV, ESQUIRE OF REILLY, MCDEVITT & HENRICH, P.C. ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT ACME MARKETS, INC. ACCEPTED BY: NG TRANSACTION ID: 67437931 NOTICE |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 31, 2022 RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF TAMMY GARCIA, ON THURSDAY, APRIL 7, 2022, BEGINNING AT 10:00 A.M. VIA ZOOM ACCEPTED BY: NG TRANSACTION ID: 67439260 RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 11, 2022 DEFENDANT ACME MARKETS, INC'S NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF TAMMY GARCIA, ON WEDNESDAY, MARCH 30, 2022, BEGINNING AT 10:00 A.M. VIA ZOOM. ACCEPTED BY: AK TRANSACTION ID: 67382694 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 8, 2022 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ACCEPTED BY: NG TRANSACTION ID: 67371587 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 2, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF HARRY W. SHENTON, IV, ESQUIRE OF REILLY, MCDEVITT & HENRICH, P.C. ACCEPTED BY: AK TRANSACTION ID: 67279863 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.