Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Newman, Shantell, filed a(n) Civil Miscellaneous (Other) case against Carrera, Dominic, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BUTLER, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUTLER, CHARLES E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Miscellaneous (Other) |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
COURT DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 16, 2021 COURT DISMISSAL |
|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 13, 2021 ORDER UPON INITIAL REVIEW OF COMPLAINT, SIGNED BY J. BUTLER ON FEBRUARY 9, 2021: IT IS ORDERED THAT THE COMPLAINT BE DISMISSED BECAUSE PROSECUTORS ARE IMMUNE FROM SUIT. IT IS SO ORDERED. ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66337445 ORDER |
|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 13, 2021 LETTER TO PETITIONER, SIGNED BY L. GONZALEZ ON FEBRUARY 11, 2021: YOUR APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS HAS BEEN DENIED AND YOUR COMPLAINT HAS BEEN DISMISSED BY THE ASSIGNED JUDGE PURSUANT TO THE REASONS STATED IN THE ORDER. ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66337445 LETTER |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 29, 2021 COMPLAINT ACCEPTED BY: CC TRANSACTION ID: 66291098 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 29, 2021 IN FORMA PAUPERIS ACCEPTED BY: CC TRANSACTION ID: 66291098 MOTION PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ON **ODP_CDADOCT_PARTY_NAME DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 29, 2021 SUMMONS ACCEPTED BY: CC TRANSACTION ID: 66291098 SUMMONS |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANEOUS COMPLAINT FILED DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 29, 2021 INT FILING MISCELLANEOUS COMPL |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 29, 2021 CIS ACCEPTED BY: CC TRANSACTION ID: 66291098 CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 29, 2021 PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: CC TRANSACTION ID: 66291098 PRAECIPE FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.