Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Moore, Debra, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hendee, Michael J, against Vessels Transport Llc, Church Ii, Brian, Leonick, Mary, Szenes, Wayne, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BUTLER, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUTLER, CHARLES E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 SIGNED ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL - CASE CLOSED ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66935376 ORDER |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 16, 2021 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66933810 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 10, 2021 30 DAY LETTER TO COUNSEL REQUESTING A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL BE FILED WITHIN 30 DAYS ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66832810 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JULY 22, 2021 1 WRIT ISSUED ON 7-16-21 FOR LONG ARM; READY FOR PICK UP ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66785393 WRIT ISSUED |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JULY 9, 2021 INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR SETTING HEARING DATE FOR THURSDAY, AUGUST 5, 2021 AT 4:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66750927 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLURIES PRAECIPE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 9, 2021 AMENDED FIRST PLURIES PRAECIPE - LONG ARM AMENDED FIRST PLURIES SUMMONS - LONG ARM ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66665008 PLURIES PRAECIPE |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MAY 25, 2021 WRIT RETURN -BRIAN CHURCH, II - PERSONALLY SERVED 05-12-2021 ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66626337 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: MAY 11, 2021 (1) 1ST PLURIES WRIT ISSUED ON 5-7-21 FOR LONG ARM SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66585858 WRIT ISSUED |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: MAY 11, 2021 (1) 1ST PLURIES WRIT ISSUED 5-7-21 NCC SHERIFF CK# 107478 $30.00 ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66585858 WRIT ISSUED |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT DATE DOCKETED: MAY 6, 2021 DEFENDANT BRIAN CHURCH II AND VESSELS TRANSPORT LLC'S CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66572460 CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.