Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Arreola, As Next Friend Of G.M., A Minor, Annabell, Mendoza, Fernando, Villa-Gomez, Oscar, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Silverman, Michael I, against Selgado, Luis, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BUTLER, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUTLER, CHARLES E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 14, 2023 ORDER SIGNED BY: BUTLER, CHARLES E SO ORDERED (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL, WITH PREJUDICE. JUDGE'S SIGNATURE REQUIRED.) ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 70182149 ORDER |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 9, 2023 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL, WITH PREJUDICE. JUDGE'S SIGNATURE REQUIRED. ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 70150791 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
STATUS REPORT DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 7, 2023 STATUS REPORT. RE: THE PARTIES HAVE RESOLVED THE CASE AT MEDIATION HELD TODAY, APRIL 5, 2023. PLEASE ACCEPT THIS AS THE PARTIES' STATUS REPORT. ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69739602 STATUS REPORT |
|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 6, 2023 THIS LETTER IS A CONFIRMATION THAT THE COURT HAS BEEN NOTIFIED IN THE ABOVE-REFERENCED CASE THAT THE PARTIES HAVE SETTLED THIS MATTER AS TO ALL CLAIMS AND ALL PARTIES. IN ORDER FOR THE COURT TO CLOSE ITS FILE, A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL MUST BE FILED. IF A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL, OR A LETTER STATING THE STATUS OF THIS MATTER, IS NOT FILED WITH THE COURT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS LETTER, THE COURT WILL DISMISS THIS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69738468 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
EVENT CONTINUED / RESCHEDULED DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 20, 2023 EVENT CONTINUED / RESCHEDULED |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 28, 2023 ORDER SIGNED BY: BUTLER, CHARLES E THIS MATTER IS HEREBY STAYED UNTIL AFTER THE SCHEDULED MEDIATION HAS OCCURRED. COUNSEL SHOULD NOTIFY CHAMBERS OF THE OUTCOME OF THE MEDIATION. ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69009998 LETTER |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 26, 2023 LETTER TO THE COURT REQUESTING CONTINUANCE FOR MEDIATION ACCEPTED BY: NG TRANSACTION ID: 68985419 LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 26, 2023 INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR SETTING HEARING DATE FOR WEDNESDAY, APRIL 5, 2023 AT 2:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: NG TRANSACTION ID: 68972078 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JULY 29, 2022 NOTICE OF RECORDS ONLY DEPOSITION OF THE JOHN DICKINSON HIGH SCHOOL, HILLENDALE PEAT MOSS AND MRM LANDSCAPING, LLC ON AUGUST 29, 2022 AT 10:00 A.M. WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67870531 NOTICE |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: MAY 20, 2022 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF DEPOSITION ACCEPTED BY: AQ TRANSACTION ID: 67635344 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.