Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gbadyu, Dehdo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by O'Neill, Jonathan B, against Leon, Humberto Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BUTLER, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUTLER, CHARLES E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 18, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 9, 2022 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67703583 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE SETTLED DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 8, 2022 CASE SETTLED |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT FILED DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 16, 2021 DEFENDANT'S AFFIDAVIT FOR INTERROGATORIES ACCEPTED BY: TNW TRANSACTION ID: 67166470 AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 15, 2021 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67165995 NOTICE SRV ANS INTERROGATORIES |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 8, 2021 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67149115 NOTICE SRV RSP RQST PRODUCTION |
|
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 13, 2021 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES & REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT ACCEPTED BY: AK TRANSACTION ID: 67086435 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT FILED DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 29, 2021 AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF, DEHDO GBADYU ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66968826 AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 29, 2021 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES AND RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66968826 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF: DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 22, 2021 RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF T 11-5-2021, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66950306 RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: JULY 28, 2021 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF FOR 8-30-3031, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66800462 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.