Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pope, Jimmie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Shelsby Jr., Gilbert F, against Mason, Janet, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BUTLER, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUTLER, CHARLES E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 17, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 8, 2023 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 70574945 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 31, 2022 INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM ARBITRATOR SETTING HEARING DATE FOR TUESDAY, MAY 3, 2022 AT 1:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: NG TRANSACTION ID: 67437390 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
EVENT CONTINUED / RESCHEDULED DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 25, 2022 EVENT CONTINUED / RESCHEDULED |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 26, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY: BUTLER, CHARLES E LETTER ORDER STAYING THIS MATTER PENDING THE BINDING ARBITRATION WHICH IS TO BE SCHEDULED. THE TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAVE BEEN REMOVED FROM THE COURT'S CALENDAR. ACCEPTED BY: TNW TRANSACTION ID: 67256939 LETTER |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
BINDING ARBITRATION NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 18, 2022 BINDING ARBITRATION NOTICE |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 19, 2022 LETTER FROM PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL ADVISING THAT THIS MATTER IS UNDERGOING BINDING ARBITRATION AND REQUESTING A STAY. ACCEPTED BY: AK TRANSACTION ID: 67236990 LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: JULY 16, 2021 DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF JIMMIE D. POPE ON AUGUST 02, 2021 AT 10:00 A.M.. THE DEPOSITION WILL BE HELD VIA VIDEO CONFERENCING. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE INCLUDED. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66768214 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 8, 2021 PLAINTIFF JIMMIE POPE'S DESIGNATION OF EXPERT EXHIBIT A- DR. HASENBOEHLER'S NARRATIVE REPORT CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE- PLAINTIFF JIMMIE POPE'S DESIGNATION OF EXPERT ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66663885 NOTICE |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MAY 20, 2021 NOTICE OF SERVICE - PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66613714 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 3, 2021 ORDER SIGNED BY: BUTLER, CHARLES E TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. TRIAL - 02-28-22; PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - 01-28-22 @ 2:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66381461 SCHEDULING ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.